Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3954 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17360 Week
» 70376 Month
» 189903 Year
» 3216756 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1727 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4727 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9506 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
69506 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22583 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 31/05/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1920 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/05/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/05/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Condensers removed |
11/1931 |
Condenser fitted |
11/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1727 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22583 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4727 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9506 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69506 |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
31/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69506 |
|
|