Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1741 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4741 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9520 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69520 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22597 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1921 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1949 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Scrap Yard) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1741 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22597 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4741 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9520 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69520 |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69520 |
|
|