Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 456 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14499 Week
» 79453 Month
» 282117 Year
» 3308970 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2588 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9555 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69555 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6215 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/04/1959 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1932 |
Condenser fitted |
06/1942 |
Condensers removed |
09/1944 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2588 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6215 |
|
|
03/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
06/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9555 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69555 |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
06/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69555 |
|
|