Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 556 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6763 Week
» 4276 Month
» 232160 Year
» 1453725 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2593 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 9560 m/e 07/1946
BR 69560 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class N2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6220
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Tue 18/10/1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
34C Hatfield 4w/e 19/05/1951
34A Kings Cross 5w/e 22/09/1951
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
34F Grantham w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn 18/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 27/11/1946
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach 02/02/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 20/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick 22/06/1947
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 34C Hatfield w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   18/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1948 Robinson pattern superheater fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2593
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6220
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9560    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
12/1948 Modification Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69560    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
18/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69560    

prev prev