Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2665 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9571 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69571 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3694 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/06/1961 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2665 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3694 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9571 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69571 |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
01/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69571 |
|
|