Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1199 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19002 Week
» 72018 Month
» 191545 Year
» 3218398 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2682 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9588 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69588 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2220 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/02/1960 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HAT |
Hatfield |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1949 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2682 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2220 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9588 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69588 |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
29/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69588 |
|
|