Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15889 Week
» 68905 Month
» 188432 Year
» 3215285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
547 |
m/e |
03/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5547 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9280 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69280 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3580 |
To Service |
During 03/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/11/1955 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
40C |
Louth |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 547 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3580 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5547 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9280 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69280 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
22/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69280 |
|
|