Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
903 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5903 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9327 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69327 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/09/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
40C |
Louth |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 903 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5903 |
|
|
08/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9327 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69327 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
17/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69327 |
|
|