Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 11 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2872 Week
» 21654 Month
» 269947 Year
» 1154328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 7995 y/e 1924
GER 995E m/e 01/1924
LNER (1946) 9617 m/e 01/1947
BR 69617 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N701/1924
N7/404/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Condensors (when built) Fitted
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1924
Withdrawal w/e Mon 04/07/1960
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34C Hatfield 4w/e 15/11/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/12/1953
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/02/1957
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/03/1958
30A Stratford w/e 06/12/1958
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7995    
01/1924 To Service To service as GER Number 995
Built at Stratford Works
   
07/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9617    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69617    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69617    

prev prev