Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 173 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 173 Week
» 6307 Month
» 234191 Year
» 1455756 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 7998 y/e 1924
GER 998E m/e 02/1924
LNER (1946) 9620 m/e 01/1947
BR 69620 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N702/1924
N7/408/1947
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1924
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1924
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
30A Stratford 5w/e 24/04/1954
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/02/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A Stratford w/e 07/03/1959
   Withdrawn 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Bury St. Edmunds No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. SLS/195709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7998    
02/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 998
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9620    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69620    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69620    

prev prev