|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) (Uncertain) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
29/06/1958 | Stratford MPD | On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. | SLS/195807 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 851 Built at Gorton Works |
||
05/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9643 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69643 | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
19/05/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69643 |