Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 361 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18164 Week
» 71180 Month
» 190707 Year
» 3217560 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
907 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9652 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69652 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3897 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 10/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1925 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30E |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 907 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3897 |
|
|
01/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9652 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69652 |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69652 |
|
|