Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1340 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19143 Week
» 72159 Month
» 191686 Year
» 3218539 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2649 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9689 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69689 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
312 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/03/1957 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1937 |
Condensers removed |
06/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2649 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 312 |
|
|
03/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9689 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69689 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
25/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69689 |
|
|