Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 837 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18640 Week
» 71656 Month
» 191183 Year
» 3218036 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2652 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9692 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69692 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
315 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1937 |
Condensers removed |
07/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/03/1949 |
Altrincham Area |
The majority of the Grand National specials working over the C.L.C. section from Godley Junction to Irlam on 26/3, were worked by Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's. 'Director' Class 4-4-0 No. 2652 Edwin A. Beazley was noted banking a heavy coal train from Skelton Junction to West Timperley on 26/3. |
SLS/194905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2652 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 315 |
|
|
03/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9692 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69692 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69692 |
|
|