Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2657 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9697 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69697 |
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
320 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1933 |
Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
10/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2657 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 320 |
|
|
07/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9697 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69697 |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69697 |
|
|