Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 362 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14405 Week
» 79359 Month
» 282023 Year
» 3308876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2604 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9706 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69706 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
310 |
Works Number |
1673 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2604 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1673 |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9706 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69706 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69706 |
|
|