|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1961 | Stratford Works (Scrap Yard) | Old Works: D2202/3/16, D2950, D3496, 11157, 12132. Scrap Yard: 64698, 64767, 67726, 69681, 69721. Works Yard: D2214, D5047/94, D8405, 62015, 69656, 69702. Diesel Erecting Shop: D200/48, D5036/59/60/6/95, D5630/6/66, D5901/4, D8206, D8403/6. Erecting Shop Yard: D2575, D5040/1, D5903, DEPT33/44/5. Works Shunters: D2209/17, D2958, 12111. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2619 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1688 |
||
01/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9721 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69721 | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
16/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
19/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
04/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69721 |