Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 562 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18365 Week
» 71381 Month
» 190908 Year
» 3217761 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2630 |
m/e |
12/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9732 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69732 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
313 |
Works Number |
1704 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2630 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1704 |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9732 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69732 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69732 |
|
|