Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 110 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4070 Week
» 33656 Month
» 407669 Year
» 1629234 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1655 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9427 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69427 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N912/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Mon 27/06/1955
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1893
EHL East Hartlepool by 01/01/1923
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
54B Tyne Dock 5w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn on 27/06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   on 27/06/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
05/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
10/1947 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1655
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - East Hartlepool (EHL)    
05/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9427    
10/1947 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 69427    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
27/06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69427    

prev prev