Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
23 |
m/e |
12/1913 |
North Eastern Railway |
3023 |
y/e |
1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2415 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9113 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69113 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Stirling |
Class |
N13 |
Company History |
HBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3011 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1913 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 04/05/1953 off Neville Hill (50B) |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/05/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1947 |
Darlington Works |
The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 23 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3023 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2415 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9113 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69113 |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
04/05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69113 from Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|