Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1320 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19123 Week
» 72139 Month
» 191666 Year
» 3218519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
392 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9392 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9138 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69138 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1948 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 392 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19171 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9392 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9138 |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69138 |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
28/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69138 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |
|
|