Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 91 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17894 Week
» 70910 Month
» 190437 Year
» 3217290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
399 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9399 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9143 |
on |
17/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69143 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/06/1961 |
Inverurie Works |
Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 399 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19176 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9399 |
|
|
17/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9143 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69143 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69143 from Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|