Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
918 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9918 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9155 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69155 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1912 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. |
SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 |
Coventry (Stored) |
On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 918 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19839 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9918 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9155 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69155 |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69155 from Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|