Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4185 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17591 Week
» 70607 Month
» 190134 Year
» 3216987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
923 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9923 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9160 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69160 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1952 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/09/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 923 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19844 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9923 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9160 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69160 |
|
|
11/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
14/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69160 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|