Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1660 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15066 Week
» 68082 Month
» 187609 Year
» 3214462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
925 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9925 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9162 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69162 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1912 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/03/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. |
SLS/194801 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 925 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19846 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9925 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9162 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69162 |
|
|
02/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69162 from Polmont (64E) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|