Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3678 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17084 Week
» 70100 Month
» 189627 Year
» 3216480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
47 |
m/e |
08/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9047 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9172 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69172 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/11/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 47 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21218 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9047 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9172 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69172 |
|
|
06/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
13/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69172 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|