Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3592 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16998 Week
» 70014 Month
» 189541 Year
» 3216394 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
453 |
m/e |
01/1917 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9453 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9180 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69180 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1953 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1917 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 453 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21225 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9453 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9180 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69180 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
05/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
20/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69180 from Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|