Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1048 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18851 Week
» 71867 Month
» 191394 Year
» 3218247 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
142 |
m/e |
02/1917 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9142 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9181 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69181 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1917 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1948 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1917 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 142 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21226 |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9142 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9181 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69181 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69181 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Clarkston, Atlas Steelworks: Lanark |
|
|