Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1896 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15302 Week
» 68318 Month
» 187845 Year
» 3214698 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
22 |
m/e |
02/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9022 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9187 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69187 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1920 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/05/1948 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 2/5, Nos. 62482 Glen Mamie and 69187 were noted here lettered 'British Railways,' the latter having the number on the bunker above the L.N.E.R. cast number plate. These are the first two ex N.B.R. engines noted from Cowlairs lettered 'British Railways' and carrying the new numbers, previous types so noted being of classes 'B.1,' 'D.11,' and 'K.2.' On 18/4, 'J.36' No. 65236 (late 9660) was noted here ex shops with its name Horne restored in proper shaded transfer letters, but still lettered L.N.E.R., No. 5226 (late 9650) has also been noted with the name Haig restored. These are both stationed at Kipps. |
SLS/194806 |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
09/08/1958 |
Edinburgh Dalry Road - stored locomotives |
55165/202/33, also 64500/17 and 69187 'out of use.' |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 22 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22279 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9022 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9187 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69187 |
|
|
08/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69187 from Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|