|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
02/08/1962 | Polmont MPD | In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 29 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22280 |
||
09/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9029 | ||
03/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
03/1929 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9188 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69188 | ||
11/1953 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
11/1953 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69188 from Eastfield (65A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |