Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 783 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18586 Week
» 71602 Month
» 191129 Year
» 3217982 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
49 |
m/e |
02/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9049 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9189 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69189 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1948 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/02/1948 |
Cowlairs Works |
No engines have as yet (7/2) appeared from Cowlairs Works lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' or painted in any new style; the same remarks also apply to Q.P. Works. Further locomotives ex Cowlairs Works painted green are: Nos. 1787-89, 2679/80, while Nos. 2440/2, 9189, an 9215 were just ex Works, the latter having acquired the vacuum brake |
SLS/194803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 49 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22281 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9049 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9189 |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69189 |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
18/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69189 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
06/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |
|
|