Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 469 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19380 Week
» 84334 Month
» 286998 Year
» 3313851 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
520 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9520 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9197 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69197 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 520 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3852 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9520 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9197 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69197 |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69197 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|