Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2283 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20086 Week
» 73102 Month
» 192629 Year
» 3219482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
526 |
m/e |
03/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9526 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9203 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69203 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1953 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 526 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3858 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9526 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9203 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69203 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
12/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
26/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69203 from Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|