Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 804 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18607 Week
» 71623 Month
» 191150 Year
» 3218003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
79 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9079 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9218 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69218 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
26/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
2w/e |
04/11/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/08/1962 |
Polmont MPD |
In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1924 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 79 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9079 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9218 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69218 |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69218 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|