Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
99 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9099 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9219 |
on |
03/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69219 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1924 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/12/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/12/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1924 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 99 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9099 |
|
|
03/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9219 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69219 |
|
|
05/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69219 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|