Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 161 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4673 Week
» 27179 Month
» 330369 Year
» 1551934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9227 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9224 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69224 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1924
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1924
THJ Thornton Junction on 01/01/1948
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 12/04/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 11/04/1959
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 9227
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9224    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69224    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69224 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev