Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 461 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924 Tmp) 461N   09/05/1923
LNER (1924) 3461   09/03/1925
LNER (1946) 3921   27/07/1946
BR 63921   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 283
Works Number 1481
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service During 05/1918 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Fri 21/05/1948 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Scrapping During 05/1948 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 30 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 05/1918
DON Doncaster 11/05/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 24/12/1944
CLK Colwick 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 02/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
   Withdrawn 21/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
WDN LNG Langwith Junction 21/05/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7239)
16/10/1926 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7518)
02/02/1929 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7237)
02/11/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8855)
30/03/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9164)
10/11/1945 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8821)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/04/1920 03/07/1920 65 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/05/1923 10/10/1923 155 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 461N
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1926 16/10/1926 132 days General
Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 28/11/1928 02/02/1929 67 days General
Double dome boiler
Boiler number 7237 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/12/1929 15/02/1930 47 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1932 12/03/1932 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1933 18/11/1933 36 days General
F.W.H. in double dome
 
Doncaster Works 05/10/1935 02/11/1935 29 days General
Double dome removed
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1937 09/10/1937 99 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/02/1940 30/03/1940 50 days General
SW cab fitted
Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1942 07/03/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/04/1944 20/05/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/01/1945 03/02/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/10/1945 10/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 461
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1481
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
30/04/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.    
09/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1923. Dep: 10/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 461N
   
09/03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3461    
07/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1926. Dep: 16/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2)
   
28/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Double dome boiler
Boiler number 7237 (Diagram 2)
   
31/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1929. Dep: 15/02/1930.    
06/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932.    
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
F.W.H. in double dome
   
05/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Double dome removed
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.    
10/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
SW cab fitted
Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2)
   
31/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942.    
11/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.    
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
13/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3921    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63921 but not taken up    
05/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
21/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 3921 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev