Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 478 m/e 04/1921
LNER (1924) 3478   21/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3923   24/08/1946
BR 63923 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number -
Works Number 22692
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service During 04/1921 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Grantham (34F)
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 04/1921
DON Doncaster 12/05/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 24/12/1944
CLK Colwick 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 09/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
35B Grantham 18/06/1950
35A New England 20/08/1950
35B Grantham 11/03/1951
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 35B Grantham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 35B Grantham m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7502)
18/01/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7518)
05/05/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7712)
13/08/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8975)
24/08/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8859)
01/09/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9239)
17/11/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21006)
08/04/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21065)
17/02/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21054)
21/12/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21011)
12/08/1960 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21030)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/03/1923 09/07/1923 111 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/09/1925 21/11/1925 81 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3478
 
Doncaster Works 03/12/1927 03/03/1928 92 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1929 18/01/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1932 26/03/1932 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/04/1934 05/05/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 04/04/1936 02/05/1936 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/05/1936 30/05/1936 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1938 13/08/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 22/06/1940 13/07/1940 22 days General
SW cab fitted
 
Doncaster Works 05/09/1942 03/10/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/11/1943 20/11/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1944 17/06/1944 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/01/1946 26/01/1946 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/08/1946 24/08/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3923
 
Doncaster Works 01/08/1948 01/09/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63923
 
Doncaster Works 22/10/1950 17/11/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/03/1953 08/04/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/01/1955 17/02/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/11/1957 21/12/1957 25 days General
Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/07/1960 12/08/1960 31 days General
Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 478
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22692
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 09/07/1923.    
02/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3478
   
03/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 03/03/1928.    
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2)
   
20/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932.    
07/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2)
   
04/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.    
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.    
09/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2)
   
22/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
SW cab fitted
   
05/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.    
12/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944.    
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
05/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 26/01/1946.    
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3923
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
01/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1948. Dep: 01/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63923
   
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
22/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2)
   
11/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
10/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 08/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2)
   
19/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2)
   
27/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2)
   
13/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2)
   
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63923 from Grantham (34F)    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev