Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 657 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4788 Week
» 14958 Month
» 292754 Year
» 1177135 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 480 m/e 06/1921
LNER (1924 Tmp) 480N   01/09/1923
LNER (1924) 3480   03/07/1926
LNER (1946) 3925   20/10/1946
BR 63925 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/106/1921
O2/415/07/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number -
Works Number 22694
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service During 06/1921 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 08/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 06/1921
DON Doncaster 15/05/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 21/12/1944
CLK Colwick 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 05/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/02/1952
   Withdrawn 08/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   08/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1921 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7504)
12/12/1928 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7509)
20/05/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7706)
26/10/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7709)
26/05/1945 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9465)
04/05/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9464)
05/07/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21027)
31/07/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21019)
10/12/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21033)
15/07/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28354)
20/12/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28577)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/04/1923 01/09/1923 137 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 480N
 
Doncaster Works 27/02/1926 03/07/1926 127 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3480
 
Doncaster Works 03/10/1928 12/12/1928 71 days General
Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/10/1930 29/11/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/04/1933 20/05/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 7706 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/03/1935 13/04/1935 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1937 20/03/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/02/1939 08/04/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/09/1940 26/10/1940 36 days General
SW cab fitted
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/03/1943 03/04/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/04/1945 26/05/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1947 23/06/1947 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1949 04/05/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 9464 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63925
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1949 05/08/1949 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/06/1951 05/07/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/07/1953 31/07/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 21019 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/11/1955 10/12/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/05/1958 15/07/1958 48 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28354 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 16/11/1960 20/12/1960 35 days General
Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 02/10/1961 18/10/1961 17 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 480
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22694
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
18/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1923. Dep: 01/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 480N
   
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3480
   
03/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1928. Dep: 12/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2)
   
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.    
15/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7706 (Diagram 2)
   
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935.    
20/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937.    
25/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939.    
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
SW cab fitted
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
   
06/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943.    
15/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3925    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
18/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 23/06/1947.    
06/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1949. Dep: 04/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9464 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63925
   
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949.    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
05/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 05/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
   
03/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1953. Dep: 31/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21019 (Diagram 2)
   
09/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2)
   
29/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1958. Dep: 15/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28354 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 20/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1961. Dep: 18/10/1961.    
08/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63925 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev