|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1923 | 29/10/1923 | 152 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 481N |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1925 | 26/02/1926 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1928 | 10/08/1928 | 116 days | General | Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1930 | 04/10/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1932 | 24/12/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1934 | 19/01/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 36 days | General | SW cab fitted Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1948 | 28/10/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63926 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1949 | 11/10/1949 | 17 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21019 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1955 | 11/08/1955 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1961 | 09/03/1961 | 37 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1962 | 23/02/1962 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1962 | 20/07/1962 | 12 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 481 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22695 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1923. Dep: 29/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 481N |
||
09/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3481 | ||
10/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1925. Dep: 26/02/1926. | ||
17/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1928. Dep: 10/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 24/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 19/01/1935. | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. | ||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. | ||
07/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
13/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. | ||
19/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. | ||
05/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3926 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. | ||
15/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1948. Dep: 28/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63926 |
||
25/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 11/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21019 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955. | ||
19/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
27/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 09/03/1961. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1962. Dep: 23/02/1962. | ||
09/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1962. Dep: 20/07/1962. | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63926 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |