|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1923 | 27/10/1923 | 136 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1925 | 12/12/1925 | 102 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3482 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1928 | 03/05/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 7522 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1930 | 09/08/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 29 days | General | Diamond soot blower on |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1935 | 01/06/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 50 days | General | SW cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1947 | 08/06/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1949 | 15/07/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63927 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1950 | 30/05/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1951 | 27/07/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1953 | 02/10/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1955 | 01/12/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1958 | 13/11/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1959 | 01/08/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1963 | 08/02/1963 | 33 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 482 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22696 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
14/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923. | ||
02/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3482 |
||
16/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1928. Dep: 03/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7522 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930. | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: Diamond soot blower on |
||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. | ||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted |
||
08/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. | ||
28/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. | ||
13/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. | ||
19/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3927 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1947. Dep: 08/06/1947. | ||
10/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1949. Dep: 15/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63927 |
||
07/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1950. Dep: 30/05/1950. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 27/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
26/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1953. Dep: 02/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1955. Dep: 01/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
09/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1959. Dep: 01/08/1959. | ||
03/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1963. Dep: 08/02/1963. | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63927 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |