Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 98 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4567 Week
» 5457 Month
» 313438 Year
» 1197819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 483 m/e 07/1921
LNER (1924 Tmp) 483N   07/11/1923
LNER (1924) 3483 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 3928   01/08/1946
BR 63928 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/107/1921
O2/415/07/1961
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number -
Works Number 22697
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service During 07/1921 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 08/09/1963 off Grantham (34F)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 07/1921
DON Doncaster 06/09/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 17/01/1945
CLK Colwick 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 09/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 24/11/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
34F Grantham 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn 08/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 24/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   08/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1921 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7505)
08/02/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7236)
08/08/1936 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8973)
11/11/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8185)
01/02/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21013)
30/06/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21014)
28/06/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21003)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 14/06/1923 07/11/1923 147 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 483N
 
Doncaster Works 18/12/1925 26/03/1926 99 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/02/1928 18/05/1928 80 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1930 08/02/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 7236 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/03/1932 23/04/1932 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/06/1934 14/07/1934 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1936 08/08/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 8973 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/08/1938 20/08/1938 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/04/1940 25/05/1940 29 days General
SW cab fitted
 
Doncaster Works 15/08/1942 12/09/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1944 11/11/1944 36 days General
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/10/1946 26/10/1946 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1948 23/08/1948 44 days General
Renumbered to BR 63928
 
Doncaster Works 26/02/1950 07/03/1950 10 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 09/01/1951 01/02/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 21013 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/02/1952 03/05/1952 84 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/05/1953 30/06/1953 41 days General
Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1955 28/06/1955 42 days General
Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/11/1957 04/01/1958 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/09/1959 24/09/1959 15 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 02/06/1961 15/07/1961 44 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 483
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22697
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
14/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1923. Dep: 07/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 483N
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3483    
18/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926.    
29/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1928. Dep: 18/05/1928.    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7236 (Diagram 2)
   
26/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.    
16/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.    
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8973 (Diagram 2)
   
06/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.    
27/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
SW cab fitted
   
15/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942.    
06/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
   
17/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3928    
12/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.    
24/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1948. Dep: 23/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63928
   
26/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1950. Dep: 07/03/1950.    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21013 (Diagram 2)
   
10/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.    
21/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1953. Dep: 30/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2)
   
18/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2)
   
29/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1957. Dep: 04/01/1958.    
10/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959.    
02/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1961. Dep: 15/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
   
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63928 from Grantham (34F)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev