|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 102 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 486N |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 75 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3486 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1928 | 14/04/1928 | 87 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1928 | 30/11/1928 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7508 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 36 days | General | SW cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9385 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1949 | 24/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63931 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1952 | 31/08/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1953 | 01/06/1953 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1955 | 03/06/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1958 | 01/02/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1961 | 06/01/1962 | 48 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 486 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22700 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
05/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 486N |
||
01/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3486 |
||
19/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928. | ||
23/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1928. Dep: 30/11/1928. | ||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. | ||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7508 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. | ||
08/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. | ||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted |
||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3931 | ||
11/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9385 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1949. Dep: 24/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63931 |
||
24/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1952. Dep: 31/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 01/06/1953. | ||
05/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1955. Dep: 03/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1958. Dep: 01/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1961. Dep: 06/01/1962. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63931 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |