Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 111 Week
» 7295 Month
» 315276 Year
» 1199657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924 Tmp) 492N   15/12/1923
LNER (1924) 3492 m/e by 07/1925
LNER (1946) 3937   13/09/1946
BR 63937 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1579
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 15/12/1923 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 08/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 39 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 15/12/1923
DON Doncaster 11/12/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 21/09/1944
GRA Grantham 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham 09/02/1947
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 18/10/1953
   Withdrawn 08/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham 09/02/1947
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   08/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/12/1923 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7706)
22/10/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7715)
07/05/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7709)
06/07/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9240)
10/06/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9365)
22/12/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8858)
01/08/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21054)
07/01/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21061)
04/09/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21053)
12/10/1960 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21066)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/12/1925 17/03/1926 87 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/02/1928 27/04/1928 74 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/07/1930 16/08/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/09/1932 22/10/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 7715 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/03/1934 05/05/1934 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/02/1936 14/03/1936 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/12/1936 31/12/1936 27 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/03/1938 07/05/1938 50 days General
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1940 06/07/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/03/1943 17/04/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/05/1945 23/06/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1947 10/06/1947 38 days General
Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1947 12/12/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/11/1949 22/12/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63937
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1952 01/08/1952 30 days General
Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/08/1953 26/08/1953 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 04/12/1954 07/01/1955 35 days General
Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/07/1957 04/09/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 22/08/1960 12/10/1960 52 days General
Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/12/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 492
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1579
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3492    
21/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 17/03/1926.    
14/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1928. Dep: 27/04/1928.    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.    
24/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7715 (Diagram 2)
   
31/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.    
15/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.    
05/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.    
19/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2)
   
20/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.    
11/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
19/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
13/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3937    
09/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
04/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1947. Dep: 10/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2)
   
19/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1947. Dep: 12/12/1947.    
20/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1949. Dep: 22/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63937
   
03/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2)
   
18/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 26/08/1953.    
18/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
04/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 07/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2)
   
31/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2)
   
22/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 12/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2)
   
08/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63937 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev