|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1925 | 17/03/1926 | 87 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1928 | 27/04/1928 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1932 | 22/10/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7715 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1938 | 07/05/1938 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1947 | 10/06/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1947 | 12/12/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1949 | 22/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63937 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1952 | 01/08/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1953 | 26/08/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1954 | 07/01/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1957 | 04/09/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1960 | 12/10/1960 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 492 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1579 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
07/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3492 | ||
21/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 17/03/1926. | ||
14/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1928. Dep: 27/04/1928. | ||
05/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. | ||
24/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7715 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. | ||
15/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. | ||
05/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. | ||
19/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. | ||
11/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
13/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3937 | ||
09/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
04/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1947. Dep: 10/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9365 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1947. Dep: 12/12/1947. | ||
20/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1949. Dep: 22/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63937 |
||
03/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 26/08/1953. | ||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 07/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 12/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63937 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |