|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1926 | 31/07/1926 | 125 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1929 | 25/05/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 36 days | General | Diamond soot blower on Boiler number 7514 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9242 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1947 | 15/06/1947 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1949 | 10/05/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9248 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63938 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1949 | 30/08/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1951 | 06/11/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1953 | 27/03/1953 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1954 | 28/05/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21043 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1956 | 31/10/1956 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1958 | 16/07/1958 | 41 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28148 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28271 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1961 | 20/01/1962 | 55 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 493 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1580 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
01/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3493 | ||
29/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926. | ||
20/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 25/05/1929. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. | ||
26/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Diamond soot blower on Boiler number 7514 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. | ||
24/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. | ||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9242 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. | ||
10/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
12/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3938 | ||
13/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1947. Dep: 15/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 10/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9248 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63938 |
||
12/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1949. Dep: 30/08/1949. | ||
09/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 06/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953. | ||
02/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1954. Dep: 28/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21043 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
04/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1956. Dep: 31/10/1956. | ||
06/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1958. Dep: 16/07/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28148 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28271 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1961. Dep: 20/01/1962. | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63938 from Grantham (34F) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |