|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1926 | 08/06/1926 | 119 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1928 | 28/06/1928 | 96 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1930 | 09/08/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7501 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1932 | 04/02/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3939 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1949 | 11/08/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9244 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63939 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1952 | 22/02/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21048 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1956 | 13/03/1956 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1960 | 11/01/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 494 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1581 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3494 | ||
10/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1926. Dep: 08/06/1926. | ||
25/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1928. Dep: 28/06/1928. | ||
05/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7501 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 04/02/1933. | ||
12/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. | ||
10/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3939 |
||
09/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
11/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1949. Dep: 11/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9244 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63939 |
||
25/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21048 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956. | ||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
28/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 11/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63939 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |