Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 867 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3182 Week
» 31140 Month
» 65782 Year
» 1287347 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924 Tmp) 495N   06/02/1924
LNER (1924) 3495 m/e by 07/1925
LNER (1946) 3940   08/12/1946
BR 63940 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1582
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 06/02/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 06/02/1924
DON Doncaster 10/12/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 17/01/1945
GRA Grantham 25/06/1945
36A Doncaster 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/02/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7709)
22/07/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7691)
07/08/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number G982)
15/01/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4404)
02/03/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9162)
21/10/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9239)
06/02/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9471)
07/05/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9463)
23/09/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9015)
12/06/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21051)
01/11/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21069)
03/02/1959 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21039)
30/08/1962 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21020)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 15/04/1926 15/10/1926 184 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/10/1928 28/12/1928 72 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/11/1930 31/12/1930 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/06/1933 22/07/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1935 15/06/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/07/1937 07/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/01/1938 15/01/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/01/1940 02/03/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/02/1941 08/03/1941 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1942 13/06/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/09/1944 21/10/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/09/1945 08/09/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 24/12/1946 06/02/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1948 07/05/1948 26 days Heavy
Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63940
 
Doncaster Works 10/08/1948 25/08/1948 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/08/1949 23/09/1949 40 days General
Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/05/1952 12/06/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/08/1954 01/09/1954 28 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1956 10/11/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 30/12/1958 03/02/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/10/1960 25/10/1960 15 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1962 30/08/1962 52 days General
Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/02/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 495
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1582
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3495    
15/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 15/10/1926.    
18/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1928. Dep: 28/12/1928.    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930.    
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935.    
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 15/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
   
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.    
16/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.    
10/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2)
   
17/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
01/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3940    
24/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1946. Dep: 06/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
   
12/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63940
   
10/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 25/08/1948.    
15/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 23/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2)
   
19/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 12/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2)
   
05/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 01/09/1954.    
10/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2)
   
30/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 03/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
   
11/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960.    
10/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1962. Dep: 30/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2)
   
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63940 from Doncaster (36A)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev