Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 467 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 10200 Month
» 238084 Year
» 1459649 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3497 on 22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3942   28/07/1946
BR 63942 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1587
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 22/03/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 08/09/1963 off Grantham (34F)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 22/03/1924
DON Doncaster 10/02/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 24/09/1944
DON Doncaster 30/11/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
34F Grantham 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn 08/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   08/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/03/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7711)
30/04/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7515)
09/05/1936 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8859)
17/10/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7716)
21/09/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8857)
23/10/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21002)
13/10/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21059)
22/04/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21070)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
04/01/1959 Doncaster MPD (Stored) On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). SLS/195902
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/01/1927 02/04/1927 89 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/06/1929 27/07/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/03/1932 30/04/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/05/1934 23/06/1934 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/04/1936 09/05/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/03/1937 20/03/1937 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/06/1938 02/07/1938 8 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1940 08/06/1940 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/04/1941 26/04/1941 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1942 17/10/1942 29 days General
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/06/1944 29/07/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/08/1946 21/09/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/04/1948 19/05/1948 39 days General
Renumbered to BR 63942
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1950 23/10/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/09/1952 13/10/1952 34 days General
Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/02/1957 09/03/1957 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 20/03/1961 22/04/1961 34 days General
Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/02/1962 02/06/1962 97 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3497
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1587
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
04/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1927. Dep: 02/04/1927.    
22/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.    
26/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2)
   
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.    
11/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
   
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937.    
25/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.    
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.    
19/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941.    
19/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
   
10/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.    
24/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
30/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3942    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 19/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63942
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
20/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 23/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2)
   
10/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1952. Dep: 13/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2)
   
06/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957.    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
20/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2)
   
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
26/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 02/06/1962.    
08/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63942 from Grantham (34F)    

prev prev