Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3498   29/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3943   17/08/1946
BR 63943 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1589
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 29/03/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 29/03/1924
DON Doncaster 12/12/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 24/09/1944
DON Doncaster 20/11/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
34F Grantham 27/11/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 11/06/1961
34F Grantham 16/07/1961
36A Doncaster 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/03/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7712)
04/11/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8185)
28/08/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7691)
26/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8859)
17/08/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8976)
24/06/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8821)
29/09/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21001)
23/02/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21018)
01/06/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21045)
26/05/1962 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21061)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/08/1926 11/12/1926 125 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1929 02/03/1929 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1931 30/05/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1933 04/11/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/07/1935 10/08/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1937 28/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/10/1937 09/10/1937 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1939 25/11/1939 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/12/1939 09/12/1939 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1940 31/08/1940 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/11/1940 28/12/1940 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1941 19/04/1941 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1942 26/12/1942 57 days General
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/12/1944 06/01/1945 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1946 17/08/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3943
 
Doncaster Works 22/05/1948 24/06/1948 34 days General
Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63943
 
Doncaster Works 24/08/1950 29/09/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1952 29/02/1952 41 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1954 23/02/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1957 01/06/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1961 22/02/1961 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/04/1962 26/05/1962 44 days General
Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/03/1963 29/03/1963 11 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/03/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 3498
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1589
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
09/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926.    
19/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931.    
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
   
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.    
07/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2)
   
09/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.    
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.    
02/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.    
20/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940.    
09/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.    
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941.    
31/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.    
20/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3943
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63943
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2)
   
20/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952.    
19/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 23/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
   
26/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2)
   
27/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
07/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1961. Dep: 22/02/1961.    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
16/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
13/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2)
   
19/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1963. Dep: 29/03/1963.    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63943 from Doncaster (36A)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev